According to a new University of Connecticut (UConn) study, titled “Maternal Support of Children’s Math Learning in Associations...

How to multiply easily two 3-digt numbers in your head, for example 234 x 890:

200 x 800 = 160,000 200 x 90 = 18,000 200...

How to multiply easily two 3-digt numbers in your head , for example 234 x 567:

200 x 500 = 100,000 200 x 60 = 12,000 20...

How to multiply easily two 3-digit numbers in your head, for example 234 x 234:

200 x 200 = 40,000 200 x 30 = 6,000 200...

The ChildUp Early Learning Model Since 2005, the ChildUp team of early childhood development expert...

ChildUp Early Learning Key #4: The goal is to be quite s...